skip to content

Stuart, Katherine Elizabeth

CPSO#: 95499

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Palmerston North Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
50 Ruahine Street, Private Bag 1103
Palmerston North 4442 New Zealand
Palmerston North 4410
New Zealand
Phone: +64 63569169

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Zealand

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATHERINE ELIZABETH STUART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STUART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016