skip to content

Strike, Melanie Katherine

CPSO#: 95936

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Royal Ottawa Mental Health Ctr
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone: 6137226521 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: 6137222000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

2244 Innes Rd
Gloucester ON  K1B 4C4
Canada
Phone: 613-824-6080
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Melanie Strike Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 20 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Strike ( CPSO# 95936 )

Business Address:
The Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Z 7K4
Phone Number: (613) 722-6521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:18 May 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Forensic Psychiatry Effective:26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELANIE KATHERINE STRIKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRIKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 04 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 05 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 04 May 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 05 May 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 04 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 05 May 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Forensic Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2017