skip to content

Strauss, Matthew Steven

CPSO#: 91314

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi St.
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone: (519) 822-5350 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

76 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Matthew Strauss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 16 2017
Corporation Name: Matthew Strauss Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Strauss ( CPSO# 91314 )

Business Address:
Guelph General Hospital
115 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 200-8563

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MATTHEW STEVEN STRAUSS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STRAUSS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2012