skip to content

Stratton, Julia Lynn

CPSO#: 98483

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 14 Jul 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 14 Jul 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 14 Jul 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 15 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jul 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2018