skip to content

Stoyka, William Wasily

CPSO#: 21229

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Mar 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Mar 2014
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1965

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 18 Nov 1970 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 1968
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 24 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 29 May 2013
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Mar 2014

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 31, 2014
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Undertaking by Dr. William Wasily Stoyka to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario (the “College”). (NOTE: This is a summary of the undertaking. For the complete terms, contact the College’s Membership Services Department):

I, Dr. William Wasily Stoyka:

(2) Acknowledge that I was the subject of an investigation under section 75 of the Health Professions Procedural Code (the “Investigation”) by the College regarding whether I maintained the standard of practice of the profession and whether I am incompetent in the practice of medicine.

(3) Acknowledge that there has been no referral to the Discipline Committee of the College in respect of the Investigation.

(4) Acknowledge that I entered into an Undertaking dated April 24, 2013 (my “Previous Undertaking”), which was accepted in resolution of the Investigation, but that since that time I have not complied with the professional education obligations set out in my Previous Undertaking at paragraph B(5) thereof. I further acknowledge that I did not commence the clinical supervision contemplated by paragraph B(4) of my Previous Undertaking, and as a consequence have ceased to practise medicine.

(5) Hereby resign from the College effective March 31, 2014 (the “Effective Date”).

(6) Hereby undertake not to apply or re-apply for registration as a physician to practise medicine in Ontario or any other jurisdiction after the Effective Date.

(7) Agree that in the event that the College should became aware that I have applied or re-applied for registration to practise medicine in any jurisdiction after the Effective Date, the College shall have the right to proceed with a disciplinary proceeding on the basis of a breach of this undertaking and/or my Previous Undertaking and, if successful, shall have the right to re-commence the Investigation.

(13) Acknowledge that the terms of this undertaking will be entered on the register as information that is available to the public.

The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.