skip to content

Stovel, Rebecca Gilman

CPSO#: 91358

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 01 Sep 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medicine
Room D4-70A
Phone: 416-480-5108
Fax: 416-480-5500

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Hospital
Department of Medicine
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: 416-480-6100
Fax: 416-323-6212
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective:26 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REBECCA GILMAN STOVEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STOVEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 28 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2012 to 31 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 02 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2015