skip to content

Story, Eden Sarah

CPSO#: 91019

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Childrens Hospital Eastern Ontario
Department of Hematology & Oncology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Eden S. Story Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 06 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Story ( CPSO# 91019 )

Business Address:
Children's Hospital Eastern Ontario
Department of Hematology & Oncology
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-7600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Hematology/Oncology Effective:27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EDEN SARAH STORY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STORY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 09 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 10 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 04 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2013