skip to content

Stone, Tanya Adrienne Robyn

CPSO#: 95221

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Welcare Centre
Suite 305
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone: (416) 962-2964
Fax: (416) 962-2526 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medcan Clinic
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Canada
Phone: (416) 350-5900
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Tanya Stone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Stone ( CPSO# 95221 )

Business Address:
The Welcare Centre
1366 Yonge Street
Suite 305
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 962-2964

Business Address:
150 York Street
Suite 1500
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TANYA ADRIENNE ROBYN STONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STONE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013