skip to content

Stone, Susan Joan

CPSO#: 30184

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 1976
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Stone, Susan Van Steenburgh (used until: 11 May 2010 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
ICHA (Inner City Health Associates)
59 Adelaide St E
Toronto, Ont
Toronto ON  M5C 1K6
Phone: (416) 591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Susan Stone Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Stone ( CPSO# 30184 )

Business Address:
Seaton House
339 George Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 338-3187

Business Address:
3306 Kingston Road
Scarborough ON  M1N 1P8

Business Address:
Robertson House
291 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M5A 2R9
Phone Number: (416) 392-5667

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sioux Lookout,Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1978 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUSAN JOAN STONE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STONE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1978