skip to content

Stone, Karina Alexandra

CPSO#: 94198

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 24 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Universidad Central de Venezuela, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Centre for Addiction and Mental Health, Health Records Department, 175 College Street, Toronto, ON, M5T 1P7
Date Received: 23 Jun 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:03 May 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Jul 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 11 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2011
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2016