skip to content

Stilwell, Moira Evelyn

CPSO#: 31041

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 15 Aug 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 22 Jul 1999

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:25 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist
Nuclear Medicine Effective:21 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1978 to 30 Jun 1979
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 1979
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Dec 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jul 1999
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2013