skip to content

Stewart, Peter David

CPSO#: 25213

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Jun 1990
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Jun 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Michigan, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Orleans Urgent Care Clinic
Suite 100
1220 Promenade Place d'Orleans
Orleans ON  K1C 7K3
Phone: (613) 541-5389 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: P. David Stewart Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Stewart ( CPSO# 25213 )

Business Address:
1220 Promenade Place d'Orleans
Suite 100
Orleans ON  K1C 7K3
Phone Number: (613) 541-5389

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1986 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PETER DAVID STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1972
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Jul 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1990