skip to content

Stewart, Paula Jane

CPSO#: 30143

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Oct 1987
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Oct 1987

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
458 Laurier Ave
Brockville ON  K6V 7A3
Phone: (613) 345-5685
Fax: (613) 345-2879 Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 03 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAULA JANE STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 22 Jan 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 1979
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 1987