skip to content

Stewart, James Kenneth

CPSO#: 97020

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Dec 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:International American University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
339 Hume St
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W4
Phone: 705-443-8200
Fax: 705-443-4311 Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES KENNETH STEWART may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEWART is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 08 Nov 2011 to 30 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 31 Jan 2012 to 07 Nov 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 08 Nov 2012 to 07 Nov 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Nov 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2013