skip to content

Stewart, Donald James

CPSO#: 27360

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 03 Jan 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 Jan 2019

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Woolwich CHC 10 Parkside Dr St. Jacobs ON N0B 2N0
Date Received: 04 Jan 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1983 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jan 2019