skip to content

Stevenson, Robert Francis

CPSO#: 26338

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Feb 1974
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Feb 1974

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4-100 Waterloo Rd
Timmins ON  P4N 4X5
Phone: 705-267-7327 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

R & S Vision Centre
Unit 4
100 Waterloo Road
Timmins ON  P4N 4X5
Canada
Phone: (705) 267-7327
Fax: (705) 267-7328
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:07 Nov 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT FRANCIS STEVENSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEVENSON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 1971
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 1974