Sternthal, Edward
CPSO#:
25411
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Jan 1973
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 1964
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
The Rudd Clinic
400-123 Edward St
Toronto ON M5G 1E2
Date Received: 15 Apr 2019
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:14 Mar 1973 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jan 1973 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2019 |
Concerns
Source:
Compliance and Monitoring Department
Active Date: July 5, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:
A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)
Member-reported Findings of Malpractice/Professional Negligence
On September 30, 2015, at the Small Claims Court in Toronto, a finding of professional negligence was made against Dr. Edward Sternthal in respect to an incident that took place in May 2010.