skip to content

Sterling, Lynn Eleonora

CPSO#: 98135

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 505
3200 Dufferin Street
North York, Ontario
Toronto ON  M2K 2Z3
Phone: (416) 287-8080
Fax: (416) 287-3593 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Lynn Sterling Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Sterling ( CPSO# 98135 )

Business Address:
Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Avenue
North York ON  M3M 3G7

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LYNN ELEONORA STERLING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STERLING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017