Sterling, Cara Lesley (CPSO#: 98121)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Sep 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sherman Health and Wellness Centre
9600 Bathurst Street, Suite 300
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone: 289-269-1522
Fax: 905-303-9773
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Cara Sterling Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sterling ( CPSO# 98121 )

Business Address:
Sherman Health and Wellness Centre
Suite 300
9600 Bathurst Street
Vaughan ON  L6A 3Z8
Phone Number: (289) 269-1522

Business Address:
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CARA LESLEY STERLING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STERLING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Obstetrics)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2014