skip to content

McKenzie, Stephen Wayne

CPSO#: 30023

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Member deceased as of 18 Jul 2022
EXPIRY DATE
18 Jul 2022
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Jun 1978

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 18-Jul-2022

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education: University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Stephen W. McKenzie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. McKenzie ( CPSO# 30023 )

Business Address:
630 - 101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 273-6460

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:08 Dec 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1978
Expired: Member deceased. Expiry date: 18 Jul 2022