Steiner, Meir (CPSO#: 42447)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 07 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German, Hebrew

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Meir Steiner Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 19 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 23 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Academic Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Aug 2018