skip to content

Steinberg, Steven Garry

CPSO#: 29388

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jun 1983
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Nov 1997

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
105 Landon St
Bonfield ON  P0H1E0
Phone: (705) 776-3655
Fax: 705 776-1940 Electoral District: 08

Medical Records Location

Address: Jey's Business Record Storage 705.482.1838
Instructions: Patients please contact above to request a copy of medical records
Date Received: 15 Feb 2018

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEVEN GARRY STEINBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEINBERG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1983
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 1997