skip to content

Stein, Raymond David

CPSO#: 31346

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 19 Feb 1980

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education:University of Cape Town, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
600 Sherbourne Street
Suite 415
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone: (416) 961-2933
Fax: (416) 961-3016 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Raymond D. Stein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Stein ( CPSO# 31346 )

Business Address:
Suite 415
600 Sherbourne Street
Toronto ON  M4X 1W4
Phone Number: (416) 961-2933

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1979 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology Effective: 30 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAYMOND DAVID STEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEIN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Feb 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1979
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1980