skip to content

Stein, Nina Rodrigues

CPSO#: 91493

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Portuguese

Education:University of Rio Grande Sul, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
HHS McMaster Univ Medical Centre
Department of Diagnostic Radiology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 76807 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Nina Stein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Seed ( CPSO# 85250 )
Dr. N. Stein ( CPSO# 91493 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Portugal

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:06 Jul 2018 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric Radiology Effective:06 Jul 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 03 Sep 2009
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Paediatric Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Paediatric Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 25 Nov 2016 Active
             Dr. Nina Rodrigues Stein may practise medicine independently in diagnostic
            radiology.