skip to content

Stein, Corey Miles

CPSO#: 98134

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

3024 Hurontario Street
Suite 307
Mississauga ON  L5B4M4
Canada
Phone: 9052764535
Fax: 9052761218
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Corey Stein Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 31 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Abitbol ( CPSO# 100952)
Dr. C. Stein ( CPSO# 98134 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. COREY MILES STEIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016