skip to content

Konasiewicz, Stefan Joseph

CPSO#: 60999

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Jun 2022

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French, Italian, Spanish, Ukrainian

Education: Queen's University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
17730 Leslie St
YORK MEDICAL
CHRONIC PAIN CLINIC
UNIT 102
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3E4
Phone: 905-830-0667 E
Fax: 905 853 0200 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

17730 LESLIE ST
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3E4
Canada
Phone: 905 830 0667
Fax: 905 853 0200
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

340 York Blvd
suite 200
Hamilton ON  L8R 3L2
Canada
Phone: 9055275454
Fax: 9055294646
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

17730 Leslie St
YORK SURGICAL
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3E4
Canada
Phone: 289 803 9119
Fax: 9052351277
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

2888 Bathurst St
universal interventional pain clini
North York ON  M6B 4H6
Canada
Phone: 416 256 0600
Fax: 416 256 0602
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

204-10376 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3B8
Canada
Phone: 9058839797
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Stefan Konasiewicz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 08 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Konasiewicz ( CPSO# 60999 )

Business Address:
Suite 204 - 205
10376 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 3C7
Phone Number: (905) 883-9797

Business Address:
2888 Bathurst St
TORONTO ON  M6B H6
Phone Number: 4162560600

Business Address:
340 York Blvd suite 200
Hamilton ON  L8R 3L2
Phone Number: 9055275454

Business Address:
17730 Leslie Street
Newmarket ON  L3Y 3E4
Phone Number: (905) 853-0404


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Texas

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:28 Aug 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Research Fellows - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
CF - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
CF - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2022
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 15 Jun 2022

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 15 Jun 2022 Active
 UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
("Undertaking")

of

DR. STEFAN JOSEPH KONASIEWICZ
("Dr. Konasiewicz")

to 

COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
(the "College")
________________________________________

A.	PREAMBLE

(1)	In this Undertaking:
"Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2 to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as amended;
"Discipline Tribunal" means the Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal of the College;
"OHIP" means the Ontario Health Insurance Plan; 
"Ontario Physicians and Surgeons Discipline Tribunal" means the Discipline Committee established under the Code;
"Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the public.

(2)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, certificate of registration number 60999, am a member of the College.  

(3)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, acknowledge that following a public complaint and a report to the College, the College conducted investigations bearing File Numbers CAS-136186-G7N1W2 and CAS-132400-X3K9M9 (the "Investigations") into my delegation practice, including delegation of acts outside my scope of practice, and my role as a medical director/physician consultant at a cosmetic clinic.

(4)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, acknowledge that, in addition to accepting this Undertaking, the College will also deliver a caution in person.

B.	UNDERTAKING

(5)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking, effective immediately.

(6)	Practice Restrictions

(a)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, undertake to permanently resign my position as medical director/physician consultant with Marco's Derma Care Cosmetic Clinic no later than March 31, 2022.  

(b)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, undertake to abide by the College's policy on "Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of Practice and/or Re-entering Practice"

(7)	Professional Education  

(a)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, undertake to participate in and successfully complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education (the "Professional Education"):

(i)	Review, reflection, and a written summary of the following policies and other self-study:    
        
1.	Delegation of Controlled Acts, College policy;

2.	Ensuring Competence: Changing Scope of Practice and/or Re-entering Practice, College policy; and

3.	Consent to Treatment, College policy.

(b)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, undertake to provide proof to the College of my successful completion of the Professional Education, including proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have successfully completed the Professional Education.

(c)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, undertake to complete this requirement within three (3) months.

(d)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, acknowledge that a report or reports may be provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with the Professional Education.

(8)	Monitoring 

(a)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, undertake to inform the College of each and every location at which I practise or have privileges, including, but not limited to, any hospitals, clinics, offices, and any Independent Health Facilities with which I am affiliated, in any jurisdiction (collectively my "Practice Location" or "Practice Locations"), within five (5) days of executing this Undertaking.  Going forward, I further undertake to inform the College of any and all new Practice Locations within five (5) days of commencing practice at that location.

(b)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, undertake that I will submit to, and not interfere with, unannounced inspections of my Practice Locations and patient records by a College representative for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(c)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make appropriate enquiries of OHIP, and/or any person who or institution that may have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking.

(d)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, acknowledge that I have executed the OHIP consent form, attached hereto as Appendix "B".

C.	ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

(9)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

(10)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc. arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this Undertaking. 

(11)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, acknowledge that I have read and understand the provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my right to do so.

(12)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, acknowledge that the College will provide this Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs of Staff").

(13)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to the Discipline Tribunal of the College.

(14)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms, conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

(15)	Public Register

(a)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, acknowledge that, during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on the Public Register.

(b)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking being posted in accordance with section (15)(a) above, the following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
Following a public complaint and a report of information received by the College, College investigations were conducted into Dr. Konasiewicz' delegation practice and his role as a medical director/physician consultant at a cosmetic clinic. As a result of the investigations:

Dr. Konasiewicz will permanently resign his position as medical director/physician consultant with Marco's Derma Care Cosmetic Clinic no later than March 31, 2022. 
Dr. Konasiewicz will engage in professional education, including in delegation, scope of practice and consent to treatment.
D.	CONSENT

(16)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the following information to any person who requires this information for the purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

(a)	any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking;

(b)	any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment of, my practice; and 

(c)	any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(17)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

(18)	I, Dr. Konasiewicz, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff, to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

(a)	any information relevant to this Undertaking;

(b)	any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my compliance with this Undertaking;  

(c)	any information which comes to their attention in the course of providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.



Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: June 15, 2022
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Stefan Joseph Konasiewicz to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective June 15 2022:
 Following a public complaint and a report of information received by the College, College investigations were conducted into Dr. Konasiewicz’ delegation practice and his role as a medical director/physician consultant at a cosmetic clinic. As a result of the investigations:
Dr. Konasiewicz will permanently resign his position as medical director/physician consultant with Marco’s Derma Care Cosmetic Clinic no later than March 31, 2022.
Dr. Konasiewicz will engage in professional education, including in delegation, scope of practice and consent to treatment.
Download Full Document (PDF)