skip to content

Steele, Robert

CPSO#: 18249

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Scottish Conjoint Board(Scottish triple), 1952

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 02 Dec 1976 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 May 1962
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 09 Mar 1964
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 May 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 27 Jul 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008