skip to content

Steele, John Charles

CPSO#: 17828

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 21 Aug 1985
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Apr 1961
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Apr 1968
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 26 Oct 1973
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Mar 1983
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 Aug 1985