skip to content

Steele, Brian Thomas

CPSO#: 31792

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University of Belfast, 1969

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 107 King Street West Dundas ON L9H 1V1
Date Received: 06 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:17 Nov 1981 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 1970
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1980
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016