skip to content

Steel, Andrew Christopher

CPSO#: 85868

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Apr 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Apr 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of London, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Room 11PMB 121
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone: (416) 340-4746 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andrew Christopher Steel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Steel ( CPSO# 85868 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Room 11PMB121
585 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2N2
Phone Number: (416) 340-4746

Business Address:
Centre for Addiction and Mental Health
Toronto ON  M6J 1H4
Phone Number: (416) 535-8501

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Toronto ON  M5G 2C1
Phone Number: (416) 946-2000

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 596-4200


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health,Queen Street Site Toronto
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Kensington Eye Institute Toronto
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:08 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW CHRISTOPHER STEEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEEL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2014