skip to content

Stasko, Jody Ann

CPSO#: 93517

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 16 Dec 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Dec 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Metropolitan campus
1995 Lens Avenue
Windsor ON  N8W 1L9
Phone: (519) 973-4411 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A1E1
Canada
Phone: 519-973-4411
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jody Stasko Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JODY ANN STASKO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STASKO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 16 Dec 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 17 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 16 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 17 Dec 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Dec 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2015