skip to content

Starova, Blerta

CPSO#: 97727

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Albanian, English

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
William Osler Health Centre
Department of Lab Medicine
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Street East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: B. Starova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 05 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Starova ( CPSO# 97727 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
William Osler Health Centre
Department of Lab Medicine
2100 Bovaird Street East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. BLERTA STAROVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STAROVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018