skip to content

Staroselsky, Arthur

CPSO#: 85730

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Oct 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Sep 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian, Ukrainian

Education:Doneck Medical University, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Disera Drive U100
Thornhill ON  L4J 0A7
Phone: 9057717755
Fax: 9057717752 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

1410 Major MacKenzie Dr West
Unit C7-8
Maple ON  L6A 4H6
Canada
Phone: 905-669-2994
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Staroselsky Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 20 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Staroselsky ( CPSO# 85730 )

Business Address:
30 Disera Drive U 100
THORNHILL ON  L4J 0A7
Phone Number: 9057717755

Business Address:
Suite 210
31 Disera Drive
Thornhill ON  L4J 0A7
Phone Number: (905) 771-7755


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Israel

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:31 Aug 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARTHUR STAROSELSKY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STAROSELSKY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2007 to 23 Dec 2007
AVP - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 24 Dec 2007 to 03 Sep 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Sep 2008 to 03 Sep 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Apr 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Clinical Pharmacology and Toxicology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2009