skip to content

Stapleton, Andrew Jay

CPSO#: 27332

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016
EXPIRY DATE
01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 17 Jun 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. J. Stapleton Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 7 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Box 1108 152 High Street Sutton ON L0E 1R0
Date Received: 29 Apr 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016