skip to content

Stanley, Wayne Edgar

CPSO#: 85675

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 21 Aug 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Afrikaans, English

Education: University of Pretoria School of Medicin, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 06 Oct 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 06 Oct 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Jun 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Nov 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2009
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 07 Jul 2014
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 21 Aug 2015

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 21 Aug 2015
Summary:

On August 21, 2015, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Stanley engaged in sexual abuse of patients and disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional conduct. Dr. Stanley did not contest the allegations.
 
Patient A saw Dr. Stanley five times between October 2006 and January 2012. In January 2012, Patient A complained of a sore testicle. Under the guise of a clinical examination, Dr. Stanley masturbated Patient A and asked him sexually charged questions. As the encounter continued, Patient A became nervous and said “this is weird” a few times, causing Dr. Stanley to stop abruptly.

Patient B saw Dr. Stanley fifteen times between October 2006 and February 2013. Patient B had suffered injuries, including a fracture of the pelvis. At an appointment in 2009, Dr. Stanley raised the issue of a “broken penis” [Peyronies Disease]. Under the guise of a clinical examination, Dr. Stanley masturbated Patient B while making sexually changed comments.  Patient B stated words to the effect of, “this isn’t going to happen.” Dr. Stanley stopped and Patient B pulled his pants up.
 
The Discipline Committee ordered that:
 
- the Registrar revoke Dr. Stanley’s certificate of registration, effective immediately.
- Dr. Stanley appear before the panel to be reprimanded. 
- Dr. Stanley reimburse the College for funding provided to patients under the program required  under section 85.7 of the Code, by posting an irrevocable letter of credit or other security acceptable to the College, within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order, in the amount of $32,120.00 ($16,060.00 for each patient).
- Dr. Stanley pay costs to the College in the amount of $4,460.00, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.
 
 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): August 21, 2015

Concerns

Source: Other
Active Date: February 20, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
CHARGES
Wayne Stanley was charged with the following offences:

1. 2 Counts of Sexual Assault, between January 1, 2013 and January 1, 2015, contrary to Section 271 of the Criminal Code of Canada.
2. 2 Counts of Sexual Exploitation of a young person, between January 1, 2013 and January 1, 2015, contrary to Section 153(1)(a) of the Criminal Code of Canada
3. 2 Counts of Sexual Interference with a person under 16, between January 1, 2013 and January 1, 2015, contrary to Section 151 of the Criminal Code of Canada.

Date of charge: February 7, 2020
Place of charge: Lindsay, Ontario
Kawartha Lakes Police Service

 

Source: Other
Active Date: February 20, 2020
Expiry Date:
Summary:
BAIL CONDITIONS
On January 24, 2020, the following conditions of release (bail conditions) were imposed on Wayne Stanley:

1. Notify Kawartha Lakes Police Service within 24 hours and in writing of any change of your address.
2. Do not contact or communicate directly or indirectly with specified individuals.
3. Do not go to any known place of residence, education, employment or worship of the specified individuals.

 

Source: Member
Active Date: February 12, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Wayne Edgar Stanley to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 12, 2017:

Dr. Stanley’s Certificate of Registration was revoked by Order of the Discipline Committee on August 21, 2015. Dr. Stanley was the subject of an additional referral to the Discipline Committee on allegations that he engaged in sexual abuse of two patients and that he has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or unprofessional.

On the basis that Dr. Stanley has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction, the College has withdrawn the additional referral to the Discipline Committee.
Download Full Document (PDF)