skip to content

Stanley, Katherine Sigrun

CPSO#: 88743

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: 416-461-8272 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Katherine S. Stanley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 05 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Stanley ( CPSO# 88743 )

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Suite 5-5700
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-4501

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KATHERINE SIGRUN STANLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STANLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012