skip to content

Standen, James Ronald

CPSO#: 17571

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 May 2005
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Aug 1987

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1959

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:15 Nov 1965 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1960
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 May 1961
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 1966
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 May 1975
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1987
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 May 2005