skip to content

Stan, Florentina

CPSO#: 89558

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Sep 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 30 Sep 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Medicine and Pharmacy, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5500 North Service Road
Unit 104
Burlington ON  L7L 6W6
Phone: (905) 333-5437
Fax: (905) 333-5352 Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:15 Nov 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 23 Sep 2008
AVP - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 08 Aug 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Developmental Pediatrics

McMaster University, 09 Aug 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Feb 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Aug 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Nov 2018 Active
             Dr. Florentina Stan may practise medicine independently in paediatrics.