skip to content

Stacpoole, Rebecca Anne

CPSO#: 86565

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
4279 Hixon St.
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B0
Phone: (905) 563-5315
Fax: (905) 563-0933 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Rebecca Stacpoole Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Stacpoole ( CPSO# 86565 )

Business Address:
4279 Hixon Street
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B0
Phone Number: (905) 563-5315

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REBECCA ANNE STACPOOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STACPOOLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2009