Stack, Gerald Edward (CPSO#: 100632)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
124 Barker Street
London ON  N5Y 1Y1
Phone: 519-601-0400
Fax: 519-937-1690
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Stack Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 5 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERALD EDWARD STACK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STACK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015