skip to content

Stacey, Paul Jeffrey

CPSO#: 92950

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Clinic South
Hotel Dieu Shaver Hospital
541 Glenridge Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2T 4C2
Phone: (905) 685-1381
Fax: (905) 685-5390 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Paul Stacey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre,Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Corporation,St. Peter's Hospital Hamilton
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAUL JEFFREY STACEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STACEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 Sep 2010
AVP - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2015