skip to content

St-Onge, Natasha Evelyn

CPSO#: 98340

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Northern Roots Medical Group
555 Barrydowne Road
Suite 105
Sudbury ON  P3A 3T4
Phone: (705) 524-7312
Fax: (705) 524-7897 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

Health Sciences North
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Canada
Phone: (705) 523-7100
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Primacy Medical Centre
c/o Real Canadian Superstore
1485 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 5H7
Canada
Phone: (705) 222-7451
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

1485 Bancroft Drive
Sudbury ON  P3B1R6
Canada
Fax: 705-222-3372
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Natasha Evelyn St-Onge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 24 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. St-Onge ( CPSO# 98340 )

Business Address:
Northern Roots Medical Group
555 Barrydowne Road
Suite 105
Sudbury ON  P3A 3T4
Phone Number: (705) 524-7312

Business Address:
1485 Bancroft Drive
Sudbury ON  P3B 1R6

Business Address:
41 Ramsey Lake Road
Sudbury ON  P3E 5J1
Phone Number: (705) 523-7100

Business Address:
1485 Lasalle Boulevard
Sudbury ON  P3A 5H7
Phone Number: (705) 222-7451

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Health Sciences North Sudbury

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NATASHA EVELYN ST-ONGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST-ONGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014