skip to content

St. Jacques, Nicole Simone

CPSO#: 91095

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Aug 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Aug 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
194 Court St. N
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone: (807) 346-1000 Ext. 7758
Fax: (807) 346-6209 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nicole St. Jacques Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 15 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. N. St. Jacques ( CPSO# 91095 )

Business Address:
194 Court Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7A 4V7
Phone Number: (807) 346-1000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NICOLE SIMONE ST. JACQUES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST. JACQUES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2011