skip to content

St. Jacques, Arianne Loraine

CPSO#: 95553

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
710 Victoria Ave E
Suite 300
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 5P7
Phone: 8076845101
Fax: 8074753028 Electoral District: 09

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Regional HSC
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: 8076846000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Hospital for Sick Children
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Canada
Phone: 416-813-1500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. A. St. Jacques Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 23 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. A. St. Jacques ( CPSO# 95553 )

Business Address:
St Josephs Care Group
301 Lillie Street North
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 0A6
Phone Number: (807) 684-5100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective:26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ARIANNE LORAINE ST. JACQUES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST. JACQUES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Child and Adolescent Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017