skip to content

St George-Hyslop, Peter Henry

CPSO#: 31657

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Jun 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Tanz Centre for Research
in Neurodegenerative Diseases
6th Floor 6KD417
60 Leonard Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 0S8
Phone: (416) 507-6861
Fax: (416) 507-6435 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Peter St George-Hyslop Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. P. St George-Hyslop ( CPSO# 31657 )
Dr. V. Fried ( CPSO# 50598 )

Business Address:
Suite 305
1366 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M4T 3A7
Phone Number: (416) 962-2273

Business Address:
Tanz Centre for Research in
Neurodegenerative Diseases
Krembil Discovery Tower, 6th Fl - 6KD417
60 Leondard Avenue
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 507-6861

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:22 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Neurology Effective:28 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PETER HENRY ST GEORGE-HYSLOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST GEORGE-HYSLOP is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 1980