skip to content

St. Amant, Krista Michelle

CPSO#: 93281

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
281 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 5J5
Phone: (519) 823-5133 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. St. Amant Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 05 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. St. Amant ( CPSO# 93281 )

Business Address:
281 Stone Road East
Guelph ON  N1G 5J5
Phone Number: (519) 823-5133

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KRISTA MICHELLE ST. AMANT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST. AMANT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012