skip to content

Srour, Nadim

CPSO#: 88562

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 04 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Sherbrooke, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may contact: 3120 Boulevard Taschereau Greenfield Park, Quebec J4V 2H1 Tel: (514) 465-4606
Date Received: 21 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:10 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2008 to 31 Aug 2009
CF - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 6 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Clinician Investigator

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 2013