skip to content

Srour, David

CPSO#: 86377

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Reactivation Care Centre - Church
Southlake- 3rd Floor, building B
200 Church Street
Toronto ON  M9N 1N8
Canada
Phone: 416-243-4416
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Reactivation Care Centre - Finch
Southlake Site - 5th floor
North York ON  M3N 1N1
Canada
Phone: 416-747-3211
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: David Srour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Srour ( CPSO# 86377 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
200 Church Street
York ON  M9N 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 249-8111

Business Address:
2111 Finch Avenue West
North York ON  M3N 1N1
Phone Number: (416) 744-2500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID SROUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SROUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009