skip to content

Srivastava, Amresh Kumar

CPSO#: 85793

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Mar 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Nov 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:Indore University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



India

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:14 Nov 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2006
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Nov 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 05 Apr 2009
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jan 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Mar 2018