skip to content

Srikanthan, Amirrtha

CPSO#: 89117

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology
Room C2323
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70170
Fax: (613) 247-3511 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Amirrtha Srikanthan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 03 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Srikanthan ( CPSO# 89117 )

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Room C2323
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:08 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMIRRTHA SRIKANTHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SRIKANTHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 08 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Medical Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Dec 2015
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012